+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 27, 2008 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On May 23, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2008
On May 19, 2008 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
On May 14, 2008 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 9, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 23, 2008
On May 1, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 18, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 9, 2008
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 008-005-000
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 31, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia