+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
- Session Sine Die
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1,2
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Do Pass as Amended Education; 009-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 28, 2008
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2008
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Education
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Education
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Luechtefeld
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Luechtefeld
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2008
- Assigned to Education
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 11, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-006-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 018-001-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Reitz
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that there is no rulemaking authority under the amendatory Act, but that the Governor may suggest rules by filing them with the General Assembly and requesting that the General Assembly authorize such rulemaking by law, enact the suggested rules into law, or take other appropriate action in the General Assembly's discretion.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that a pupil who becomes non-resident during a grading period or school term, as determined by school board policy (instead of a pupil who becomes non-resident during a grading period), shall not be charged tuition for the remainder of the grading period or school term in which he or she became a non-resident pupil.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that a pupil who becomes non-resident during a grading period or school term, as determined by school board policy (instead of a pupil who becomes non-resident during a grading period), shall not be charged tuition for the remainder of the grading period or school term in which he or she became a non-resident pupil.
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/10-20.12a - from Ch. 122, par. 10-20.12a