+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 26, 2010 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 25, 2010 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sidney H. Mathias
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 010-001-000
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On January 4, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 23, 2009 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sidney H. Mathias
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor