+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On April 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 8, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 27, 2008 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 013-000-000
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 31, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Renée Kosel
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
April 2, 2008: HB4720 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 02, 2008
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor