+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On July 15, 2004 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0739
- Effective Date July 1, 2006
- Governor Approved
On June 3, 2004 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 29, 2004
- Second Reading
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2004
- Do Pass Labor & Commerce; 007-000-000
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce
On April 1, 2004 in the House:
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
On April 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
On March 26, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Lovana Jones
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles G. Morrow, III
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Consumer Protection Committee
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 010-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Consumer Protection Committee; by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Charles E. Jefferson
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Monique D. Davis
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Karen May
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles G. Morrow, III
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the new provisions do not apply to the collection, use, or release of a social security number by the State, a subdivision of the State, or an individual in the employ of the State or a subdivision of the State in connection with his or her official duties.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the new provisions do not apply to the collection, use, or release of a social security number by the State, a subdivision of the State, or an individual in the employ of the State or a subdivision of the State in connection with his or her official duties.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 5, 2004: HB4712 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 05, 2004
March 31, 2004: HB4712 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 31, 2004
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor