+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (53)
- Session Sine Die
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Morrison
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 11, 2021
- Second Reading
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2021
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 10, 2021
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Postponed - Insurance
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2019
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
- Postponed - Insurance
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
- Postponed - Insurance
- Assigned to Insurance
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-041-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Bob Morgan
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 013-004-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Business Corporation Act of 1983. Provides that if the board of directors is authorized to determine the place of a meeting of shareholders, the board of directors may determine that the meeting shall not be held at any place, but may instead be held solely by means of remote communication. Provides that a corporation may allow shareholders to participate in and act at any meeting of the shareholders through the use of remote connection; however, the corporation shall implement reasonable measures to provide the shareholders a reasonable opportunity to participate in the meeting and to vote on matters submitted to the shareholders. Provides that the corporation may implement reasonable measures to verify that each person deemed present and entitled to vote at the meeting by means of remote communication is a shareholder. Makes corresponding changes. Effective immediately.
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code and the Health Maintenance Organization Act. Provides that all individual and small group accident and health policies written in compliance with the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act must file rates with the Department of Insurance for approval. Provides that rate increases found to be unreasonable rate increases in relation to benefits under the policy provided shall be disapproved. Requires the Department to provide a report to the General Assembly after January 1, 2021, regarding both on and off exchange individual and small group rates in the Illinois market. Requires that the Department approve or deny rate increases within 60 calendar days after the rate increase is filed with the Department. Provides that a rate increase that is not approved or denied by the Department on the 61st calendar day shall be automatically approved on that day. Provides that no less than 30 days after the federal Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services has certified the plans described in this Section for the upcoming plan year, the Department shall publish on its website a report explaining the rates for the subsequent calendar year's certified policies. Defines "unreasonable rate increase".
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code and the Health Maintenance Organization Act. Provides that all individual and small group accident and health policies written in compliance with the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act must file rates for approval. Provides that rate increases not found to be reasonable in relation to benefits under the policy provided will be disapproved. Requires the Department of Insurance to provide a report to the General Assembly after January 1, 2021, regarding both on and off exchange individual and small group rates in the Illinois market.
+ − Proposed Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 205 ILCS 645/1 - from Ch. 17, par. 2701
- 215 ILCS 5/355 - from Ch. 73, par. 967
- 215 ILCS 125/4-12 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1409.5
- 805 ILCS 5/7.05 - from Ch. 32, par. 7.05
- 805 ILCS 5/7.15 - from Ch. 32, par. 7.15
- 805 ILCS 5/7.30 - from Ch. 32, par. 7.30