+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 30, 2008 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0724
- Effective Date June 30, 2008
- Governor Approved
On June 11, 2008 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2008 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 047-005-000
On May 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2008
- Second Reading
On May 1, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2008
- Do Pass Education; 008-001-000
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On April 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Don Harmon
On April 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 014-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 25, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 30, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the School Code. In a Section concerning grants for preschool educational programs, provides for a distribution of funds by the State Board of Education to achieve a goal of "Preschool for All Children" through June 30, 2010 (instead of June 30, 2008). Changes the date (from July 1 to November 1) that the State Board of Education must report on the results and progress of students enrolled in preschool educational programs. Moves current language with respect to a report to the General Assembly concerning the distribution of new funding. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/2-3.71 - from Ch. 122, par. 2-3.71
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2008: HB4705 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 13, 2008
April 1, 2008: HB4705 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 01, 2008
+ − Sponsors (73)
Type:
Primary Sponsor