+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 1, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
On March 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2004
- Arrive in Senate
On March 26, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 084-000-028
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marlow H. Colvin
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 18, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 008-000-000
On March 2, 2004 in the House:
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Robin Kelly
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On February 4, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marlow H. Colvin
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Creates the Grow Our Own Teacher Education Act. Establishes the Grow Our Own Teacher Education Initiative to prepare highly skilled, committed teachers who will teach in hard-to-staff schools and hard-to-staff positions and who will remain in these schools for substantial periods of time. Provides that the Board of Higher Education shall administer the Initiative as a grant competition to fund consortia that will carry out Grow Our Own Teacher preparation programs. Provides for an independent program evaluation. Effective January 1, 2005.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Vote
March 26, 2004: HB4688 - Third Reading - Friday, March 26, 2004
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor