+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 5 ILCS 420/1-109 - from Ch. 127, par. 601-109
- 5 ILCS 420/1-110.3 new -
- 5 ILCS 420/1-110.5 new -
- 5 ILCS 420/2-101 - from Ch. 127, par. 602-101
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor