+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 14, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
On January 30, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 29, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson