+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 011-000-000
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor