+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 40 ILCS 5/4-108.8 -
- 40 ILCS 5/7-139.8 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 7-139.8
- 40 ILCS 5/9-121.10 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 9-121.10
- 40 ILCS 5/14-110 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 14-110
- 40 ILCS 5/14-152.1 -
- 30 ILCS 805/8.46 new -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor