+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On August 17, 2018 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0903
- Effective Date January 1, 2019
- Governor Approved
On June 21, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018
- Second Reading
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Education; 008-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2018
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-000-000
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On April 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 011-005-000
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 105 ILCS 5/10-22.39 -
- 105 ILCS 5/34-18.7 - from Ch. 122, par. 34-18.7
+ − Votes (5)
May 23, 2018: HB4658 - Third Reading
May 15, 2018: HB4658 - Education
April 27, 2018: HB4658 - Third Reading
April 25, 2018: HFA0001 - Elem Sec Ed: School Curric Policies
April 10, 2018: HB4658 - Elem Sec Ed: School Curric Policies
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor