+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 21, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi