+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-006-000
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- 20 ILCS 105/3 - from Ch. 23, par. 6103
- 20 ILCS 105/3.12 new -
- 20 ILCS 105/3.13 new -
- 20 ILCS 105/7.01 - from Ch. 23, par. 6107.01
- 20 ILCS 105/7.09 - from Ch. 23, par. 6107.09
- 20 ILCS 105/8.10 new -
- 20 ILCS 105/8.11 new -
- 20 ILCS 105/8.12 new -
+ − Vote
February 2, 2022: HB4656 - Human Services
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor