+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 11, 2008 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0794
- Effective Date January 1, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 18, 2008 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2008 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-001-000
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2008
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Do Pass Transportation; 008-000-000
On May 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On March 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 11, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-004-000
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 22, 2008 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 013-000-000
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On January 28, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David R. Leitch
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2008: HB4648 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 20, 2008
March 6, 2008: HB4648 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 06, 2008
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor