+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 29, 2008 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 23, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2008
On May 9, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 23, 2008
On April 18, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 9, 2008
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On January 28, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 25, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. James H. Meyer
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Further amends the Illinois Domestic Violence Act of 1986. Provides that Domestic Violence Fatality Review Teams may (instead of shall) be closed to the public under the Open Meetings Act (instead of not subject to the Open Meetings Act). Provides that confidential information obtained by a Team shall remain confidential and may not be disclosed by the Team. Provides that the proceedings, records, opinions, and deliberations of a Team may be exempt from disclosure under the Freedom of Information Act (instead of are privileged) and are not subject to discovery, subpoena, or introduction into evidence in any civil action in any manner.
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 750 ILCS 60/Art. V heading new -
- 750 ILCS 60/501 new -
- 750 ILCS 60/505 new -
- 750 ILCS 60/510 new -
- 750 ILCS 60/515 new -
- 750 ILCS 60/520 new -
- 750 ILCS 60/525 new -
- 750 ILCS 60/530 new -
- 5 ILCS 140/7 - from Ch. 116, par. 207
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor