+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 16, 2008 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0735
- Effective Date July 16, 2008
- Governor Approved
On May 29, 2008 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2008 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On May 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2008
On May 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2008
- Second Reading
On May 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2008
- Do Pass Judiciary Criminal Law; 008-000-000
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
- Assigned to Judiciary Criminal Law
On April 2, 2008 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On April 1, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 107-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Removed from Short Debate Status
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 25, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Edward J. Acevedo
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/24-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 24-3
+ − Votes (2)
May 27, 2008: HB4628 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 27, 2008
April 1, 2008: HB4628 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 01, 2008
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor