+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- To Civil Procedure Subcommittee
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 755 ILCS 45/4-6 - from Ch. 110 1/2, par. 804-6
- 755 ILCS 45/4-10 - from Ch. 110 1/2, par. 804-10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor