+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- New Act -
- 20 ILCS 3930/7 - from Ch. 38, par. 210-7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor