+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (46)
- Session Sine Die
- Secretary's Desk - Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 01,02
- House Non-Concurs by Voice Vote
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Non-Concur Rep. William Davis
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Non-Concur Rep. William Davis
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1,2
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2008
- Placed on Calendar Order of Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) January 12, 2009; 01,02
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Meeks
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Energy; 008-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1,2
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Environment and Energy
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James T. Meeks
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2008
- Do Pass as Amended Environment and Energy; 012-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2008
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2008
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment and Energy
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James T. Meeks
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
- Assigned to Environment and Energy
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 8, 2008
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 094-016-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment & Energy Committee; 017-002-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment & Energy Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Environment & Energy Committee
- Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Specifies that the term "recyclable general construction debris" includes wood that is salvaged from general construction or demotion debris and that is processed for use as fuel if (i) the requirements for the acceptance and combustion of the wood fuel are included in a fuel specification that is approved for the combustor in a permit issued by the Environmental Protection Agency and (ii) all foreign materials are removed from the wood or the contaminated wood is delivered only to parties with certain waste management and air permits. Amends the Illinois Solid Waste Management Act. Provides that the definition of "recycling" includes the combustion of wood or biomass fuel for energy recovery if (i) the requirements for acceptance and combustion of the wood or other biomass fuel are included in a fuel specification approved for the combustor in a permit issued by the Agency and (ii) all contaminants have been removed or the contaminated wood or biomass fuel is delivered only to parties with certain waste management and air permits. Provides that there is no rulemaking authority under the amendatory Act, but that the Governor may suggest rules by filing them with the General Assembly and requesting that the General Assembly authorize such rulemaking by law, enact the suggested rules into law, or take other appropriate action in the General Assembly's discretion.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Further amends the Illinois Solid Waste Management Act. In the definition of "recycling", provides that the combustion of wood or other biomass fuel for energy recovery shall not be considered "recycling" for grant or incentive programs administered by the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity. Deletes the language providing that there is no rulemaking authority under the amendatory Act.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Further amends the Illinois Solid Waste Management Act. In the definition of "recycling", provides that the combustion of wood or other biomass fuel for energy recovery shall not be considered "recycling" for grant or incentive programs administered by the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity. Deletes the language providing that there is no rulemaking authority under the amendatory Act.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 415 ILCS 5/22.38 -
- 415 ILCS 20/2.1 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 7052.1