+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 012-000-000
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 10 ILCS 5/9-50 new -
- 625 ILCS 5/11-208.3 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-208.3
- 625 ILCS 5/11-208.6 -
- 625 ILCS 5/11-208.8 -
- 625 ILCS 5/11-208.9 -
+ − Vote
February 26, 2020: HB4617 - Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor