+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John Cavaletto
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David A. Welter
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David A. Welter
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David A. Welter
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. David A. Welter
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John Cavaletto