+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On August 22, 2016 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0866
- Effective Date January 1, 2017
- Governor Approved
On June 24, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2016
- Second Reading
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 18, 2016
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 14, 2016
- Arrive in Senate
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-003-000
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 015-001-000
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John Cavaletto
+ − Statute Amended
- 520 ILCS 5/1.13 - from Ch. 61, par. 1.13
+ − Votes (3)
May 26, 2016: HB4604 - Third Reading
April 12, 2016: HB4604 - Third Reading
March 1, 2016: HB4604 - Agriculture & Conservation
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor