+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- To Property Tax Subcommittee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 35 ILCS 200/20-15 -
- 65 ILCS 5/11-74.4-3 - from Ch. 24, par. 11-74.4-3
- 65 ILCS 5/11-74.4-3.7 new -
- 65 ILCS 5/11-74.4-4 - from Ch. 24, par. 11-74.4-4
- 65 ILCS 5/11-74.4-5 - from Ch. 24, par. 11-74.4-5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor