+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 3, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
+ − Statute Amended
- 305 ILCS 5/9A-11 - from Ch. 23, par. 9A-11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor