+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 13, 2012 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0783
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 13, 2012
On June 13, 2012 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 15, 2012 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-001
On May 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2012
- Second Reading
On April 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 1, 2012
- Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Held in Executive
On April 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-003-008
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 015-002-000
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Cunningham
+ − Statute Amended
- 5 ILCS 140/7 - from Ch. 116, par. 207