+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- To Family Law & Probate Subcommittee
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 18, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 705 ILCS 405/1-3 - from Ch. 37, par. 801-3
- 705 ILCS 405/2-27 - from Ch. 37, par. 802-27
- 750 ILCS 5/203 - from Ch. 40, par. 203
- 750 ILCS 5/212 - from Ch. 40, par. 212
- 750 ILCS 5/301 - from Ch. 40, par. 301
- 750 ILCS 5/302 - from Ch. 40, par. 302
- 750 ILCS 5/403 - from Ch. 40, par. 403
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor