+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 21, 2008 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0872
- Effective Date January 1, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 25, 2008 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2008 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On May 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2008
On May 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2008
- Second Reading
On May 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2008
- Do Pass Local Government; 010-000-000
On April 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 11, 2008
- Arrive in Senate
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 21, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 20, 2008 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Reform Committee; 007-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elections & Campaign Reform Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elections & Campaign Reform Committee
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Elections & Campaign Reform Committee
On January 25, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 23, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert F. Flider
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
In the provision authorizing election boards to meet where the governing body of the municipality, township, or school or community college district, respectively, holds its regularly scheduled meetings, provides that voter records may be removed from the offices of an election authority only at the discretion and under the supervision of the election authority.
+ − Statute Amended
- 10 ILCS 5/10-10 - from Ch. 46, par. 10-10