+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 14, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 225 ILCS 25/8.1 - from Ch. 111, par. 2308.1
- 225 ILCS 25/11 - from Ch. 111, par. 2311