+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 24, 2017 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0295
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 24, 2017
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
- Second Reading
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2017
- Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - State Government
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
- Referred to Assignments
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Economic Justice & Equity Committee; 007-000-000
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Economic Justice & Equity Committee
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (4)
May 29, 2017: HB0457 - Third Reading
May 10, 2017: HB0457 - State Government
March 9, 2017: HB0457 - Third Reading
February 23, 2017: HB0457 - Economic Justice & Equity
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor