+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-000-000
- Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-000-000
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- To Family Law Subcommittee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
+ − Statute Amended
- 755 ILCS 5/11a-17 - from Ch. 110 1/2, par. 11a-17
+ − Votes (2)
March 4, 2020: HB4562 - Family Law Subcommittee
March 4, 2020: HB4562 - Judiciary - Civil
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor