+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 14, 2004 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0729
- Effective Date July 14, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 3, 2004 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2004
- Second Reading
On April 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 22, 2004
- Do Pass Health & Human Services; 009-000-000
On April 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On March 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 25, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
On March 25, 2004 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2004
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Jay C. Hoffman
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Delgado
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 5, 2004: HB4560 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 05, 2004
March 25, 2004: HB4560 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 25, 2004
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor