+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1039
- Effective Date June 2, 2022
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Will Guzzardi
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2022
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2022
- Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 009-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 4, 2022
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Assigned to Criminal Law
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 006-002-000
- Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 001
Provides that provisions regarding the dispensing of drug adulterant testing supplies apply to advanced practice registered nurses and physician assistants. Provides that the amendatory Act is effective immediately.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Removes provisions regarding waiver of criminal penalties and confidentiality. Restores language prohibiting employees or volunteers of or participants in a program established under the Act from being charged with or prosecuted for possession of certain items. Removes references to reagents, test strips, and quantification instruments. Provides that no quantity of drug adulterant testing supplies greater than necessary to conduct 5 assays of substances suspected of containing adulterants shall be dispensed in any single transaction. Removes language providing that the amendatory Act is effective immediately. Makes other changes.