+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Session Sine Die
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee
- Do Pass / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 015-010-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Public Utilities Committee
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Vote
February 1, 2022: HB4543 - Public Utilities
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor