+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-003-000
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
April 13, 2016: HB4537 - Judiciary - Criminal
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor