+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 28, 2016 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0639
- Effective Date July 28, 2016
- Governor Approved
On June 24, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2016
- Second Reading
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2016
- Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 20, 2016
- Arrive in Senate
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ron Sandack
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- 20 ILCS 3105/10.18 new -
- 20 ILCS 3125/40 -
- 20 ILCS 3125/45 -
- 20 ILCS 3918/Act rep. -
- 55 ILCS 5/5-1063 - from Ch. 34, par. 5-1063
- 55 ILCS 5/5-1064 - from Ch. 34, par. 5-1064
- 65 ILCS 5/1-2-3.1 -
- 210 ILCS 85/8 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 149