+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On February 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 23, 2006
- Arrive in Senate
On February 22, 2006 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 080-029-004
On February 1, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-002
On January 24, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley
+ − Statute Amended
- 430 ILCS 65/10 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-10
+ − Vote
February 22, 2006: HB4529 - Third Reading - Wednesday, February 22, 2006
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor