+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 13, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 5 ILCS 375/6 - from Ch. 127, par. 526
- 5 ILCS 375/7 - from Ch. 127, par. 527
- 5 ILCS 375/10 - from Ch. 127, par. 530
- 5 ILCS 375/10.5 new -
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor