+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- To Property Tax Subcommittee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor