+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (55)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0872
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2017
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 071-038-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Lost 056-055-001
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 043-008-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016
- Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 007-004-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
- Assigned to Criminal Law
- Referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 062-044-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-002-000
- Remains in Health Care Licenses Committee
- Motion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Health Care Licenses Committee; 005-005-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
- Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
Senate Amendment 001
In provisions amending the Nursing Home Care Act, provides that after January 1, 2017 (rather than June 30, 2016) the publicly accessible Health Care Worker Registry shall report if an individual is ineligible because of a disqualifying offense and has not received a waiver. Changes the effective date to January 1, 2017 (rather than upon becoming law).
House Amendment 003
In provisions amending the Health Care Worker Background Check Act, provides that when the Department of Public Health sends an applicant, student, or employee written notification of its decision whether to grant a waiver, the written notification shall include a list of the specific disqualifying offense for which the waiver is being granted not denied. Provides that the Department shall issue additional copies of the written notification upon the applicant's, student's, or employee's request.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the contents of the introduced bill with the following changes: In provisions amending the Nursing Home Care Act, removes provisions prohibiting the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation from posting specific information regarding disqualifying offenses, including the charge or date of an offense, on the Health Care Worker Registry. In provisions amending the Health Care Worker Background Check Act, provides that the Department of Public Health may, at the discretion of the Director of Public Health, grant a waiver to an applicant, student, or employee listed on the registry. In provisions concerning an applicant receiving a written notification by the Department of its decision on whether to grant a waiver, removes the exception in cases where a rehabilitation waiver is granted. In provisions concerning the Health Care Worker Registry working group, provides that the Department of Public Health and the Governor's Office shall provide the working group with any relevant aggregate data currently available that is related to the waiver process and its effectiveness. Provides that the working group shall identify any gaps in information currently collected that would inform the working group's efforts and make recommendations to the Governor's Office and the General Assembly about what additional data should be collected to evaluate and monitor the success of the waiver process by July 1, 2017. Removes provisions requiring the Department of Public Health to identify ways to analyze information regarding the employment of people with waivers and report the information to the working group. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 210 ILCS 45/3-206.01 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 4153-206.01
- 225 ILCS 46/25 -
- 225 ILCS 46/33 -
- 225 ILCS 46/40 -
- 225 ILCS 46/40.1 new -