+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On December 1, 2009 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed 070-046-000
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Vote
May 19, 2009: HB4507 - Motion - Tuesday, May 19, 2009
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor