+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 25, 2014 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0785
- Effective Date January 1, 2015
- Governor Approved
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 047-000-000
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 1, 2014
- Second Reading
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2014
- Do Pass Agriculture and Conservation; 006-000-000
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation
On April 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Motion - Move to Previous Question Rep. John D'Amico
- Motion Prevailed
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 081-020-000
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 016-000-000
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Remains in Agriculture & Conservation Committee
- Motion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 008-005-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Agriculture & Conservation Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the introduced bill and amends the Illinois Dead Animal Disposal Act to add references to cooking grease and cooking oil (rather than cooking grease and oil) throughout the bill. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Changes the definition of "garbage". Provides that "garbage" has the same meaning as in the federal Swine Health Protection Act and that it includes putrescible vegetable waste, but does not include the contents of the bovine digestive tract.
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 225 ILCS 610/1.1 - from Ch. 8, par. 149.1
- 225 ILCS 610/4 - from Ch. 8, par. 152
- 225 ILCS 610/6 - from Ch. 8, par. 154
- 225 ILCS 610/9.1 - from Ch. 8, par. 157.1
- 225 ILCS 610/9.2 - from Ch. 8, par. 157.2
- 225 ILCS 610/9.3 - from Ch. 8, par. 157.3
- 225 ILCS 610/12 - from Ch. 8, par. 160
- 225 ILCS 610/18 - from Ch. 8, par. 166
- 720 ILCS 5/48-7 -
+ − Votes (2)
May 1, 2014: HB4505 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 01, 2014
April 10, 2014: HB4505 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 10, 2014
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor