+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (50)
On July 21, 2004 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0773
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 21, 2004
On June 24, 2004 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2004 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 115-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Developmental Disabilities and Mental Illness Committee; 006-000-000
On May 25, 2004 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Developmental Disabilities and Mental Illness Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. James D. Brosnahan
On May 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; DeLeo
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On May 19, 2004 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3
On May 18, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Health & Human Services; 009-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Health & Human Services
On May 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James A. DeLeo
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, extended to January 11, 2005.
On May 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James A. DeLeo
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James A. DeLeo
On April 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 4, 2004
- Second Reading
On April 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 29, 2004
- Do Pass Health & Human Services; 011-000-000
On April 21, 2004 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Human Services
On March 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2004
- Arrive in Senate
On March 26, 2004 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On March 22, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 3, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Susana Mendoza
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Developmental Disabilities and Mental Illness Committee; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Developmental Disabilities and Mental Illness Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Developmental Disabilities and Mental Illness Committee
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Developmental Disabilities and Mental Illness Committee
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. James D. Brosnahan
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
In provisions extending continued Medicaid coverage of home-based skilled or intermediate care for persons age 21 or older, limits that coverage to services provided outside an institution.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 20 ILCS 1705/57 - from Ch. 91 1/2, par. 100-57
- 305 ILCS 5/5-2 - from Ch. 23, par. 5-2
+ − Votes (3)
May 26, 2004: SFA0003 - Concurrence - Wednesday, May 26, 2004
May 19, 2004: HB4502 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 19, 2004
March 26, 2004: HB4502 - Third Reading - Friday, March 26, 2004
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor