+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016
- Do Pass Local Government; 011-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Local Government
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 20, 2016
- Arrive in Senate
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-019-000
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 007-004-000
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 22, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
May 11, 2016: HB4501 - Local Government
April 19, 2016: HB4501 - Third Reading
April 6, 2016: HB4501 - Counties & Townships
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor