+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 3, 2009 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 032-083-002
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
- Second Reading - Standard Debate
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Prison Reform Committee; 004-003-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Prison Reform Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Prison Reform Committee
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
- Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Prison Reform Committee
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 2, 2009 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Arthur L. Turner
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Changes the name of the program from "elderly sentence adjustments" to the "Elderly Rehabilitated Prisoner Program".
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 730 ILCS 5/3-3-2 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-3-2
- 730 ILCS 5/5-8-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-8-1
- 730 ILCS 5/5-8-1.4 new -