+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 6, 2012 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0756
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 6, 2012
On June 15, 2012 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2012 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 044-000-000
On May 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2012
- Second Reading
On April 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 24, 2012
- Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 009-000-000
On April 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On March 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-005-000
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Karen May
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 018-000-000
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Raymond Poe
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 18, 2012: HB4492 - Third Reading - Friday, May 18, 2012
March 21, 2012: HB4492 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 21, 2012
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor