+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On August 16, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0199
- Effective Date August 16, 2007
- Governor Approved
On June 20, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2007
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2007
- Do Pass Judiciary Criminal Law; 009-000-000
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Criminal Law
On April 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 012-000-001
- Remains in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 003-000-002
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ruth Munson
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr.
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jil Tracy
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2007: HB0449 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 22, 2007
April 17, 2007: HB0449 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 17, 2007
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor