+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 31, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 23, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2008
On May 9, 2008 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 23, 2008
On May 5, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Drivers Education & Safety Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 9, 2008
On March 14, 2008 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Remains in Drivers Education & Safety Committee
- Motion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Drivers Education & Safety Committee; 002-005-004
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Drivers Education & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Drivers Education & Safety Committee
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to Drivers Education & Safety Committee
On January 18, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 17, 2008 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Sacia
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Horse Meat Act to repeal a Section added by Public Act 95-2 that makes it unlawful to slaughter a horse if the meat is to be used for human consumption. Amends various other Acts to make conforming changes to restore the language prior to Public Act 95-2. Provides that there is no rulemaking authority under the amendatory Act, but that the Governor may suggest rules by filing them with the General Assembly and requesting that the General Assembly authorize such rulemaking by law, enact the suggested rules into law, or take other appropriate action in the General Assembly's discretion. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor