+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date June 3, 2022
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1043
- Sent to the Governor
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura M. Murphy
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Crowe
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 048-005-000
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. LaToya Greenwood
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. LaToya Greenwood
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 095-010-002
- House Concurs
- Passed Both Houses
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2022
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 1, 2022
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 104-000-000
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 011-000-000
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Expressway Camera Act. Provides that the Illinois State Police, the Illinois Department of Transportation, and the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority shall work together to conduct a program to increase the amount of cameras along expressways and the State highway system in the counties of Boone, Bureau, Champaign, Cook, DeKalb, DuPage, Grundy, Henry, Kane, Kendall, Lake, LaSalle, Macon, Madison, McHenry, Morgan, Peoria, Rock Island, Sangamon, St. Clair, Will, and Winnebago (instead of only Cook County). Provides that any funds needed to conduct the program for use on expressways or State highway system under the jurisdiction of the Department of Transportation shall be taken from the Road Fund and shall be included in requests for qualification processes. Provides that any funds needed to conduct the program for use on expressways under the jurisdiction of the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority shall be paid for by funds from the Illinois State Tollway Highway Authority and shall be included in requests for qualification processes. Changes the Act repeal date to July 1, 2025 (instead of July 1, 2023). Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 625 ILCS 5/1-159.1 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 1-159.1
- 605 ILCS 140/5
- 605 ILCS 140/90